Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 535 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7989 Week
» 10571 Month
» 275204 Year
» 1496769 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27794 y/e c. 0
BR 58925 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1887
Withdrawal Fri 30/09/1955
Scrapping During 09/1955
Service Life 68 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1887
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 29/02/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   m/e 30/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27794    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58925    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
30/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58925