Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 505 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7959 Week
» 10541 Month
» 275174 Year
» 1496739 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7782 y/e c. 0
BR 58921 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 01/1886
Withdrawal Sat 21/08/1954
Service Life 68 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1886
8A Edge Hill 3w/e 11/12/1948
7D Rhyl 4w/e 31/12/1950
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 29/02/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 8w/e 11/07/1953
   Withdrawn on 21/08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 11/12/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny w/e 03/11/1951
LOAN 86K Abergavenny 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   m/e 31/07/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7782    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58921    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
21/08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58921