Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 105 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 3965 Week
» 6547 Month
» 271180 Year
» 1492745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7757 y/e c. 0
BR 58915 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1886
Withdrawal Thu 30/09/1954
Scrapping During 11/1954
Service Life 68 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1886
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 29/02/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 27/03/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 4E Tredegar w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 27/03/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7757    
08/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58915    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
30/09/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58915