Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 487 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7941 Week
» 10523 Month
» 275156 Year
» 1496721 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7711 y/e c. 0
BR 58903 w/e 11/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 01/1885
Withdrawal Sat 19/06/1954
Service Life 69 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1885
   Withdrawn on 19/06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 17/04/1954
WDN   on 19/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/03/1952 Bangor Shed Easter 1952. Only one Webb 0-6-2 Coal Tank remains No. 58903. The regular Menai Bridge Yard shunter is ex-L. & Y. 0-6-0 No. 12269. At Port Penryn the narrow gauge. 0-4-0T's Linda and Pamela were heavily engaged with slate traffic on Easter Tuesday. SLS/195206
30/08/1952 Bangor MPD Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. SLS/195211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7711    
11/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58903    
19/06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58903