Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 589 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8043 Week
» 10625 Month
» 275258 Year
» 1496823 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7699 y/e c. 0
BR 58900 w/e 11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1884
Withdrawal During 10/1954
Service Life 70 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1884
8C Speke Junction 5w/e 24/12/1949
3E Monument Lane 4w/e 24/02/1951
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 27/03/1954
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 19/06/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12E Moor Row 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 01/07/1950
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane m/e 28/02/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7699    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58900    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58900