Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 539 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7993 Week
» 10575 Month
» 275208 Year
» 1496773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 7692 y/e c. 0
BR 58899 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 04/1884
Withdrawal During 08/1954
Service Life 70 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1884
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 03/07/1948
LOAN 4D Abergavenny w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 4D Abergavenny w/e 23/10/1948
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7692    
28/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 58899    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
08/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58899