Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 518 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7972 Week
» 10554 Month
» 275187 Year
» 1496752 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27674 y/e c. 0
BR 58897 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1883
Withdrawal During 10/1950
Scrapping During 11/1950
Service Life 66 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1883
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 22/06/1946
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane w/e 11/09/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 06/11/1948
LOAN 10D Plodder Lane w/e 08/04/1950
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 4A Bletchley w/e 01/07/1950
WDN   on 04/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27674    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58897    
10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 58897