Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 535 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7989 Week
» 10571 Month
» 275204 Year
» 1496769 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27603 y/e c. 0
BR 58889 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1882
Withdrawal Mon 31/08/1953
Service Life 71 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1882
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1950
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/02/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 31/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   m/e 31/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27603    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58889    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
31/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 58889