Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 511 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7965 Week
» 10547 Month
» 275180 Year
» 1496745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27596 y/e c. 0
BR 58887 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 12/1881
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/04/1955
Service Life 73 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1881
4A Bletchley 4w/e 04/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 09/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2A Rugby w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 4A Bletchley w/e 21/10/1950
WDN   w/e 09/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27596    
12/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58887    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
09/04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 58887