Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 599 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8053 Week
» 10635 Month
» 275268 Year
» 1496833 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27586 y/e c. 0
BR 58885 y/e 1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1881
Withdrawal Sat 18/09/1948
Service Life 66 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1881
   Withdrawn on 18/09/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10D Plodder Lane w/e 05/07/1947
LOAN 2B Bletchley w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 4E Tredegar w/e 11/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27586    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58885    
18/09/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 58885