Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 543 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7997 Week
» 10579 Month
» 275212 Year
» 1496777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS (Dup.) 27553 y/e c. 0
BR 58880 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Tank
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1882
Withdrawal Fri 30/04/1954
Service Life 71 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1882
86K Abergavenny 4w/e 29/02/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 7w/e 31/08/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 30/04/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12E Moor Row 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 4E Tredegar w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 26/01/1952
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 09/08/1952
WDN   m/e 30/04/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 27553    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 58880    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
30/04/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58880