Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 111 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6087 Week
» 12221 Month
» 240105 Year
» 1461670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2369 on 11/09/1929
BR 42369 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/09/1929
Withdrawal Sat 15/05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 11/09/1929
9C Macclesfield 01/01/1948
9A Longsight 4w/e 06/09/1958
8E Northwich w/e 19/11/1960
12G Oxenholme w/e 10/06/1961
24L Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 23/06/1962
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 13/10/1962
8M Southport w/e 14/03/1964
9G Gorton w/e 24/10/1964
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/05/1965
   Withdrawn 15/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 12G Oxenholme 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 8M Southport 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 15/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
17/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/09/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2369
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42369    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (8M)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
08/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
15/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42369    

prev prev