Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 66 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7073 Week
» 13207 Month
» 241091 Year
» 1462656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2368 on 06/09/1929
BR 42368 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/09/1929
Withdrawal Sat 19/06/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 06/09/1929
9D Buxton (LNWR) 01/01/1948
5E Alsager 4w/e 10/08/1957
5D Stoke 8w/e 05/10/1957
1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
27C Southport w/e 15/08/1959
1A Willesden w/e 12/09/1959
1C Watford w/e 07/01/1961
1A Willesden w/e 10/06/1961
6H Bangor w/e 30/06/1962
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/11/1963
9G Gorton w/e 25/01/1964
9K Bolton w/e 29/05/1965
   Withdrawn 19/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5E Alsager 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
LOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 27C Southport 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 1C Watford 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 19/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Shed road) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/09/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2368
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
05/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42368    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Alsager (5E)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
19/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42368    

prev prev