Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 213 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7220 Week
» 13354 Month
» 241238 Year
» 1462803 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2366 on 27/08/1929
BR 42366 w/e 27/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/08/1929
Withdrawal Sat 11/04/1964
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 34 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 27/08/1929
9D Buxton (LNWR) 01/01/1948
5D Stoke 4w/e 06/10/1956
1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
14D Neasden 4w/e 22/02/1958
1A Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
27C Southport w/e 15/08/1959
1A Willesden w/e 19/09/1959
6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/06/1962
   Withdrawn 11/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
LOAN 27C Southport 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 11/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/01/1961 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: 42209/366/503/09/19, 43854, 53810, 73136/8, 48073. SLS/196102
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2366
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
27/05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42366    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
11/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42366    

prev prev