Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 218 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7225 Week
» 13359 Month
» 241243 Year
» 1462808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2347 on 17/05/1929
BR 42347 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/05/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 17/05/1929
23C Southport 4w/e 22/06/1946
5C Stafford 01/01/1948
5D Stoke w/e 20/06/1959
9C Macclesfield w/e 07/11/1959
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 10/06/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 08/12/1945
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 5D Stoke 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/05/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2347
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C)    
10/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42347    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42347    

prev prev