Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 20 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 5996 Week
» 12130 Month
» 240014 Year
» 1461579 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1196 m/e 08/1927
BR 41196 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 08/1927
Withdrawal During 07/1958
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1927
23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 22/06/1946
23C Southport 01/01/1948
17A Derby 3w/e 11/12/1948
20E Manningham 2w/e 17/06/1950
11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 17A Derby w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 14/06/1952
WDN   w/e 21/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Queens Park Works On a visit to the N.B. Loco. Co's. Queen's Park Works on 3/4 it was noted that new 'B.1' Nos. 1190-6 were in varying stages of construction and that the frames had just been laid for Nos. 1197/8; whilst the material was in the shops for locos. up to No. 1202 (K.M.) SLS/194706
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1196
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
10/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41196    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (11E)    
07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41196    

prev prev