Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 39 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6015 Week
» 12149 Month
» 240033 Year
» 1461598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1194 m/e 03/1927
BR 41194 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 03/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/09/1957
Scrapping During 09/1957
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1927
24A Accrington 01/01/1948
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 09/09/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 17/07/1951
21B Bournville 4w/e 04/10/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 07/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27C Hamilton (West) w/e 04/02/1950
EXLOAN 24A Accrington w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 26/08/1950
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 30/06/1951
LOAN 21B Bournville 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   w/e 07/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Queens Park Works On a visit to the N.B. Loco. Co's. Queen's Park Works on 3/4 it was noted that new 'B.1' Nos. 1190-6 were in varying stages of construction and that the frames had just been laid for Nos. 1197/8; whilst the material was in the shops for locos. up to No. 1202 (K.M.) SLS/194706
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1194
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A)    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41194    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
07/09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 41194    

prev prev