Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 251 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7258 Week
» 13392 Month
» 241276 Year
» 1462841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1193 m/e 03/1927
BR 41193 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 03/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/11/1958
Scrapping During 06/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1927
23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 22/06/1946
23C Southport 01/01/1948
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 16/06/1951
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 06/10/1951
27C Southport 8w/e 11/07/1953
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 31/10/1953
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 24/04/1954
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 19/06/1954
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/11/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 01/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 27A Polmadie w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/11/1957
LOAN 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   w/e 01/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Queens Park Works On a visit to the N.B. Loco. Co's. Queen's Park Works on 3/4 it was noted that new 'B.1' Nos. 1190-6 were in varying stages of construction and that the frames had just been laid for Nos. 1197/8; whilst the material was in the shops for locos. up to No. 1202 (K.M.) SLS/194706
28/10/1950 Derby Works For shops W/E 28/10/50:-12058 18A, 40065 26A, 40433 7D, 41044 15D, 41049 17D, 41053 15C, 41166 8E, 41167 5A, 41193 27A, 42312 25B, 42402 11B, 43294 18D, 3748 15C, 3932 22B, 44176 21A, 47160 6C, 7235 19A, 47591 8B, 64787 30F. No. 40433 is for special examination, which may mean withdrawal. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1193
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41193    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
01/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41193    

prev prev