Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 66 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7073 Week
» 13207 Month
» 241091 Year
» 1462656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1189 m/e 03/1927
BR 41189 w/e 29/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 03/1927
Withdrawal During 07/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1927
25F Low Moor 01/01/1948
26C Bolton 3w/e 11/12/1948
26B Agecroft 2w/e 17/06/1950
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 16/06/1951
27C Southport 4w/e 17/07/1951
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 29/11/1952
25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
26C Bolton 8w/e 11/07/1953
25F Low Moor 4w/e 24/04/1954
27C Southport 8w/e 19/06/1954
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 09/10/1954
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 05/11/1955
27C Southport 4w/e 10/08/1957
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 8w/e 05/10/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall w/e 02/06/1951
LOAN 27C Southport w/e 09/06/1951
EXLOAN 27A Bank Hall w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 30/06/1951
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/11/1952
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   w/e 28/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1189
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
29/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41189    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41189    

prev prev