Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 209 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7216 Week
» 13350 Month
» 241234 Year
» 1462799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1187 m/e 02/1927
BR 41187 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 02/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/07/1956
Scrapping During y/e 1956
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1927
24A Accrington 01/01/1948
28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 17/07/1951
27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 29/11/1952
27B Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
25F Low Moor 4w/e 24/04/1954
27C Southport 8w/e 19/06/1954
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 14/07/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 23A Bank Hall w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956
WDN   w/e 14/07/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 7/10/50:-50 1A, 40332 5A, 40478 16A, 41165 2A, 41181 9E, 1186 26C, 41187 27A, 41686 16A, 42362 9A, 42395 11B, 43795 18A, 43992 18B, 44175 22B, 44400 20E, 7674 6C, 53803 22C, 58059 15D, (6)4782 30A, 64807 38A. Ex Works: 41050, 43435, 64737, 43456, 44180, 58090, 58237. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1187
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A)    
18/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41187    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
14/07/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 41187    

prev prev