Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1136 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5951 Week
» 12085 Month
» 239969 Year
» 1461534 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1101 m/e 09/1925
BR 41101 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal Sat 08/08/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 33 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1925
24A Accrington 01/01/1948
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 2w/e 17/06/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 24/03/1951
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 19/05/1951
35C Spital Bridge 5w/e 23/06/1951
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 21/07/1951
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 11/08/1951
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 22/03/1952
25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
26C Bolton 8w/e 11/07/1953
25F Low Moor 4w/e 24/04/1954
27C Southport 8w/e 19/06/1954
25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 01/01/1955
27C Southport 8w/e 16/07/1955
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956
27C Southport 4w/e 10/08/1957
24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/11/1957
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 17/05/1958
   Withdrawn 08/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 10/06/1950
LOAN 27C Southport w/e 24/03/1951
EXLOAN 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 28/04/1951
LOAN 35C Spital Bridge w/e 30/06/1951
EXLOAN 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   08/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1951 Derby Works During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. SLS/195103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1101
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41101    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
08/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41101    

prev prev