Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 41 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7048 Week
» 13182 Month
» 241066 Year
» 1462631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1085 m/e 05/1925
BR 41085 w/e 13/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/01/1957
Scrapping During 01/1957
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1925
23C Southport 01/01/1948
27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 29/11/1952
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 11/07/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
27A Bank Hall 8w/e 16/07/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 26/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   w/e 26/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1085
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
13/05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 41085    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
26/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 41085    

prev prev