Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 216 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7223 Week
» 13357 Month
» 241241 Year
» 1462806 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 937 m/e 08/1932
BR 40937 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/04/1958
Scrapping During 05/1958
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1932
23A Bank Hall 01/01/1948
23A Bank Hall 5w/e 16/07/1949
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 09/09/1950
27C Southport 4w/e 16/06/1951
26C Bolton 4w/e 06/10/1951
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 04/10/1952
25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
24E Blackpool Central 8w/e 11/07/1953
24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
27A Bank Hall 8w/e 16/07/1955
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 19/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23A Bank Hall w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 01/01/1949
ALLOC 23A Bank Hall w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 26/08/1950
LOAN 27C Southport w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 19/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 937
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40937    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (23A)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
19/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 40937    

prev prev