Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 50 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7057 Week
» 13191 Month
» 241075 Year
» 1462640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4474 m/e 07/1928
BR 44474 w/e 10/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 07/1928
Withdrawal Thu 21/12/1961
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 33 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1928
23C Southport 01/01/1948
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 02/12/1950
25D Mirfield 4w/e 31/12/1950
   Withdrawn 21/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   21/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4474
Built at St. Rollox Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
10/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44474    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
21/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 44474    

prev prev