Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 219 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7226 Week
» 13360 Month
» 241244 Year
» 1462809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4471 m/e 06/1928
BR 44471 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 06/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/03/1960
Scrapping During 07/1961
Service Life 31 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1928
23C Southport 01/01/1948
27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 25/02/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 12/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   w/e 12/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4471
Built at St. Rollox Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
18/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 44471    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
12/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 44471    

prev prev