Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 59 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7066 Week
» 13200 Month
» 241084 Year
» 1462649 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4062 m/e 09/1925
BR 44062 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 37 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1925
23C Southport 01/01/1948
25D Mirfield 4w/e 31/12/1950
25A Wakefield 4w/e 30/01/1954
25D Mirfield 4w/e 06/11/1954
56F Low Moor 4w/e 21/09/1957
56A Wakefield w/e 16/12/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 3w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   16/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4062
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44062    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
16/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 44062    

prev prev