Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 260 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7267 Week
» 13401 Month
» 241285 Year
» 1462850 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4056 m/e 05/1925
BR 44056 w/e 10/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal Mon 11/10/1965
Scrapping During 01/1966
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1925
23C Southport 01/01/1948
55D Royston 4w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn 11/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 27/03/1965
WDN   11/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/12/1961 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4056
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
10/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44056    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
11/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44056    

prev prev