Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 69 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17872 Week
» 70888 Month
» 190415 Year
» 3217268 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4013 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
British Railways |
44013 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/10/1963 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
21A |
Saltley |
w/e |
16/08/1947 |
EXLOAN |
19C |
Canklow |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
17D |
Rowsley |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
ALLOC |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
5w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4013 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44013 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17D) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44013 |
|
|