Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1314 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14720 Week
» 67736 Month
» 187263 Year
» 3214116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3864 |
y/e |
1918 |
British Railways |
43864 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1950 |
Inter regional allocations |
The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). |
SLS/195012 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1918 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3864 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43864 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43864 |
|
|
05/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|