Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1111 |
25/02/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47528 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/02/1967 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/02/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 02/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/02/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1111 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
08/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47528 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
29/02/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47528 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|