Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 375 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14418 Week
» 79372 Month
» 282036 Year
» 3308889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1110 |
28/01/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47527 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/01/1967 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1110 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
22/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47527 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
27/11/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47527 |
|
|
11/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Bristol Bath Road TMD |
|
|