Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19825 Week
» 72841 Month
» 192368 Year
» 3219221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1109 |
28/01/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47526 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
28/01/1967 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
31/10/2007 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/01/1967 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1975 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/01/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 04/1975 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1109 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47526 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
31/10/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47526 |
|
|