Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1119 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 5934 Week
» 12068 Month
» 239952 Year
» 1461517 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 586 m/e 08/1928
BR 40586 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 2P
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/04/1961
Scrapping During 01/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1928
25C Goole 01/01/1948
24A Accrington 4w/e 12/07/1952
26D Bury 4w/e 04/10/1952
26C Bolton 4w/e 01/01/1955
24G Skipton 4w/e 10/08/1957
27C Southport w/e 23/07/1960
27A Bank Hall w/e 29/10/1960
26F Patricroft w/e 10/12/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 15/04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 02/08/1947
EXLOAN 25C Goole w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 24G Skipton 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   w/e 15/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/06/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 586
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40586    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (24G)    
23/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
15/04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40586    

prev prev