Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1106 |
25/11/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47523 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/11/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1975 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 04/1975 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/11/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
ECS |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1106 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47523 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/06/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47523 |
|
|
05/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|