Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 694 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18497 Week
» 71513 Month
» 191040 Year
» 3217893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1104 |
19/10/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47521 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/10/1966 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/10/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/10/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1104 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47521 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
21/04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47521 |
|
|
07/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|