Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 918 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18721 Week
» 71737 Month
» 191264 Year
» 3218117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1102 |
09/09/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47519 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/09/1966 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1102 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47519 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
30/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47519 |
|
|
08/10/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|