Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 105 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6081 Week
» 12215 Month
» 240099 Year
» 1461664 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2662 on 10/06/1941
BR 42662 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/06/1941
Withdrawal Sat 12/12/1964
Scrapping During 06/1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 10/06/1941
10C Patricroft 01/01/1948
6H Bangor 8w/e 16/07/1955
10C Patricroft 4w/e 08/10/1955
24A Accrington w/e 30/04/1960
27C Southport w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn 12/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 24A Accrington 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   w/e 12/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/05/1957 Penrith The 5-0 p.m. two-coach local from Oxenholme arrived behind 42662 of 12A and had a wagon of cattle for Perth attached in rear by 46455 of 12C which appeared to be carrying out shunting duties along with a 'Class 4' 0-6-0 which was occupied in the Yard. The Down Manchester-Glasgow (4-15 p.m. from Manchester Victoria) was headed on (21/5) SLS/195707

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1941 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2662
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C)    
02/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42662    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
12/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42662    

prev prev