Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 85 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7092 Week
» 13226 Month
» 241110 Year
» 1462675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2645 on 02/12/1938
BR 42645 w/e 05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/12/1938
Withdrawal Sat 11/09/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 02/12/1938
26B Agecroft 01/01/1948
87E Landore 4w/e 28/11/1959
26B Agecroft w/e 25/06/1960
27C Southport w/e 02/07/1960
   Withdrawn 11/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/10/1959
LOAN 87E Landore 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 02/07/1960
EXLOAN 26B Agecroft 5w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   w/e 11/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/11/1959 Landore MPD With four Fowler 2-6-4Ts in Derby Works, three Stanier 2-6-4Ts have had to be borrowed for the Central Wales LNW line viz. 42296, 42645/51 from Agecroft. At Swansea East Dock, 1641/52 an 6763 have been placed in store while at Danygraig six displaced Panthers have been transferred to the S.R. at Exmouth Junc. viz. 3633/79, 4666/81/94. SLS/196001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/12/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2645
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42645    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
25/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
11/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42645    

prev prev