Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 812 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8266 Week
» 10848 Month
» 275481 Year
» 1497046 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2622 on 13/07/1938
BR 42622 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 13/07/1938
Withdrawal Mon 20/02/1967
Scrapping During 07/1967
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 13/07/1938
26A Newton Heath on 01/01/1948
25F Low Moor m/e 16/06/1956
56A Wakefield w/e 14/11/1959
56F Low Moor w/e 10/09/1960
56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 14/09/1963
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 12/09/1964
   Withdrawn on 20/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 20/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/07/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2622
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42622    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
20/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42622    

prev prev