Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 218 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7225 Week
» 13359 Month
» 241243 Year
» 1462808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2621 on 06/07/1938
BR 42621 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/07/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 06/07/1938
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948
27C Southport 4w/e 12/07/1958
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 26/09/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2621
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42621    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42621    

prev prev