Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 530 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1657 Week
» 12950 Month
» 277583 Year
» 1499148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2620 m/e 07/1938
BR 42620 w/e 21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1938
Withdrawal Sat 19/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1938
26A Newton Heath on 01/01/1948
26D Bury 4w/e 06/11/1954
24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955
26A Newton Heath w/e 23/01/1960
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26E Bacup w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 30/01/1960
WDN   w/e 19/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2620
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42620    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
19/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42620    

prev prev