Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 83 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7090 Week
» 13224 Month
» 241108 Year
» 1462673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2551 on 09/07/1936
BR 42551 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24307
To Service Sat 09/07/1936
Withdrawal Sat 12/12/1964
Scrapping During 07/1965
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 09/07/1936
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948
24A Accrington 4w/e 08/09/1951
26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
24D Lower Darwen w/e 08/08/1959
27C Southport w/e 15/04/1961
   Withdrawn 12/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 12/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2551
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24307
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42551    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
12/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42551    

prev prev