Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 79 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7086 Week
» 13220 Month
» 241104 Year
» 1462669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2485 on 11/03/1937
BR 42485 w/e 02/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/03/1937
Withdrawal Sat 08/06/1963
Scrapping Fri 14/06/1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 11/03/1937
24D Lower Darwen 01/01/1948
26A Newton Heath w/e 15/04/1961
27C Southport w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn 08/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 08/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/03/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2485
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
02/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42485    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
08/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42485    

prev prev