Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 228 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7235 Week
» 13369 Month
» 241253 Year
» 1462818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2475 on 30/12/1936
BR 42475 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/12/1936 to Patricroft (10C)
Withdrawal Sat 07/10/1961
Scrapping During 08/1962
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10C Patricroft (New) 30/12/1936
24B Rose Grove 01/01/1948
5D Stoke 4w/e 30/11/1957
27C Southport 4w/e 28/12/1957
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 25/10/1958
   Withdrawn 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 05/04/1947
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 26/04/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2475
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Patricroft (10C)
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42475    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42475    

prev prev