Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 256 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7263 Week
» 13397 Month
» 241281 Year
» 1462846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2451 on 08/07/1936
BR 42451 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/07/1936
Withdrawal Sat 10/10/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 08/07/1936
3E Monument Lane 01/01/1948
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1956
24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 09/08/1958
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/09/1958
27C Southport w/e 20/06/1959
9G Gorton w/e 19/01/1963
   Withdrawn 10/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 27C Southport 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   w/e 10/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902
27/12/1958 Rugby Works 42451(26A), 73137(15C), 75052(1E), 90576 (26A), 61853(2F), 64331(2F). SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2451
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Monument Lane (3E)    
15/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42451    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
10/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42451    

prev prev