Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 59 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7066 Week
» 13200 Month
» 241084 Year
» 1462649 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2435 on 28/03/1936
BR 42435 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 28/03/1936
Withdrawal Sat 03/04/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 29 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 28/03/1936
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 22/06/1946
24C Lostock Hall 01/01/1948
5D Stoke 4w/e 30/11/1957
27C Southport 4w/e 28/12/1957
9H Patricroft w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn 03/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 03/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2435
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42435    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
03/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42435    

prev prev