Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 116 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7123 Week
» 13257 Month
» 241141 Year
» 1462706 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 196 on 03/01/1938
BR 40196 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 03/01/1938
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping Sat 09/03/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 03/01/1938
25G Farnley Junction 01/01/1948
23C Southport 3w/e 14/01/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/12/1949
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/01/1938 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 196
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Farnley Junction (25G)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40196    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40196    

prev prev