Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 81 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7088 Week
» 13222 Month
» 241106 Year
» 1462671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 191 on 01/12/1937
BR 40191 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 01/12/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 01/12/1937
24C Lostock Hall 01/01/1948
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/09/1961
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 25/11/1961
27C Southport w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 31/07/1948
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 191
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40191    
23/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40191    

prev prev