Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 85 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7092 Week
» 13226 Month
» 241110 Year
» 1462675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 90 on 20/04/1935
BR 40090 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/04/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Scrapping During 06/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 20/04/1935
19D Heaton Mersey 01/01/1948
20A Holbeck (MR) 3w/e 11/12/1948
20E Manningham 4w/e 08/09/1951
27C Southport 4w/e 03/12/1955
27C Southport w/e 18/06/1960
16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/07/1961
27C Southport w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 01/09/1951
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 27C Southport 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/04/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 90
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40090    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
08/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40090    

prev prev