Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 811 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31461 Week
» 130106 Month
» 332770 Year
» 3359623 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1025 |
01/11/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
01/11/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
06/10/1975 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
11 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,192,000 miles |
Cut Up |
m/e 01/1979 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
01/11/1963 |
MFYE |
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
09/01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
09/01/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/01/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/01/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/01/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Notes
Notes |
One of 7 Westerns withdrawn at the start of the October '75 timetable as part of the Western Region's rundown policy. Loco was withdrawn in working order. |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1025, name: WESTERN GUARDSMAN Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/01/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/01/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
06/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1025 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|